+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor