+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations