+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + Appropriations
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development + Appropriations