+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 304 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB95ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 060781702
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2006: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor