+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 7, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1744ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1744ER)
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 4-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Presented & ordered printed 970796492
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from Finance (13-Y 4-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor