+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 8, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1045)
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB622ER2)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Title Amended
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1045 (effective 7/1/00)
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB622ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 6-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 1-N 2-A)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 002569908
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 6-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 1-N 2-A)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
February 7, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor