+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ383ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted 060687260-S1
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 060687260-S1 (Norment)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 060687260-S1
- Engrossed by Senate as amended HJ383S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 068361260
- Unanimous consent to introduce