+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 108 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1374ER)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 980476813-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 980476813