+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 563 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1388ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100781D
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor