+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ820ER)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 076652422
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 076652422
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor