+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ741ER)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17104105D
+ − Sponsors (99)
Type:
Primary Sponsor