+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ338ER)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 17103877D
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 17103877D
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor