+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ391ER)
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 098019244
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 098019244
+ − Sponsors (140)
Type:
Primary Sponsor