+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ342ER)
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Printed as engrossed 020881844-E
- Engrossed by House
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 020881844
+ − Sponsors (140)
Type:
Primary Sponsor