+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 068472284
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 068472284
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor