+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ388ER)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendment (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD5465759
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1995: Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor