+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4715.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3141.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2014: SCR 94 Evans Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 24, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SCR94 Evans
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor