+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4961.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3793.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Pan.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2016: SCR 93 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 13
May 23, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SCR93 Pan
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor