+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 6023.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 10).
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 4394.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3515.) (April 26).
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2022: SCR 92 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 16
August 10, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2022: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR92 Leyva et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
April 26, 2022: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1