+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6518.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5225.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
August 23, 2018: SCR 87 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 16, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 9, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SCR87 Nguyen
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor