+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:20 a.m.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4475.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3304.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2022: SCR 87 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 6
April 21, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR87 Nielsen et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor