+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6110.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4660.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
July 5, 2018: SCR 86 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
June 28, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SCR86 Nguyen
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor