+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5926.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2372.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
August 18, 2016: SCR 86 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR86 Pan
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor