+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3074.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3018.) (April 1).
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2014: SCR 83 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR83 Monning
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 1, 2014: Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor