+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 522.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
September 3, 2013: SJR 8 Correa Senate Third Reading By GARCIA
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
August 27, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
April 15, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SJR8 Correa
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor