+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4758.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6294.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 2).
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Amended.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2014: Unfinished Business SCR79 Galgiani Concurrence
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 21, 2014: SCR 79 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
July 2, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
June 11, 2014: Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SCR79 Galgiani
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor