+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2689.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1898.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
September 2, 2015: Unfinished Business SCR78 Nielsen Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
August 31, 2015: SCR 78 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By IRWIN
- Yeas: 80
August 20, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
July 13, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR78 Nielsen
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor