+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3210.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
September 9, 2019: SCR 75 Hurtado Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
September 5, 2019: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SCR75
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor