+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2434.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9).
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1541.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Fuller.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
July 16, 2015: SCR 7 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 16, 2015: SCR 7 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 9, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
June 22, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR7 Fuller
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor