+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
On January 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 13).
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2071.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 1932.) (July 13).
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing July 13.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (3)
January 13, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Bradford et al.
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
July 13, 2021: Be adopted as amended
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor