+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2329.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1398.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
July 9, 2015: SCR 67 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 9, 2015: SCR 67 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR67 Stone
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor