+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4866.)
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Roth.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Roth.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Vote
August 11, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SR66 Roth
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor