+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1846.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
July 20, 2017: SCR 66 Mitchell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 12
July 13, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR66 Mitchell et al.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor