+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 3487.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11).
- Coauthors revised.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
September 11, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
September 5, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR65 Newman et al.
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor