+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3030.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1974.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
September 9, 2013: SCR 65 Fuller Senate Third Reading By SALAS
- Yeas: 78
August 30, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
August 26, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SCR65 Fuller
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor