+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 2787.)
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2755.) (January 12).
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Set for hearing January 12.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SR63 Skinner et al.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 9
January 12, 2022: Be adopted as amended
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3