+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On September 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3545.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 13).
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1840.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 26.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1520.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 13.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (5)
September 16, 2017: SCR 56 Anderson Consent Calendar First Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 13, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR56
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 13, 2017: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
June 13, 2017: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor