+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2014.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3727.) Ordered to the Senate.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2341.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1934.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On August 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 20.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing July 9.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
January 23, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2014: Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
September 11, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR53 Gaines
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 20, 2013: Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor