+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1333.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1818.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 989.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (5)
June 4, 2015: Unfinished Business SCR52 Huff Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: SCR 52 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: SCR 52 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
May 14, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR52 Huff
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor