+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1810.)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Vote
June 27, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SR50 McGuire et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3