+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2210.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1500.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 1, 2021: SCR 50 Ochoa Bogh Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SCR50 Ochoa Bogh et al.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor