+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3511.) Ordered to the Senate.
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 17.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1962.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing July 14.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (7)
January 27, 2016: SCR 45 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
September 11, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
September 11, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
August 20, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR45 Berryhill
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 14, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
July 14, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor