+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
May 13, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SCR44 Atkins et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor