+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2281.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 8, 2021: SCR 43 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 1, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SCR43 Newman
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor