+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3839.)
- Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3838.)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2014: Be adopted.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
June 11, 2014: Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor