+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1613.)
- Amendments by Senator Bates tabled on motion of Senator Monning. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1606.)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Vote
June 19, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SR41 De León et al.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor