+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
July 6, 2017: SCR 40 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
July 3, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
May 18, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR40 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor