+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1395.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1833.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2013: Unfinished Business SCR37 Beall
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 6
May 24, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SCR37 Beall
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor