+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 1270.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
April 17, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR36 Lara et al.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor