+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 25).
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 630.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR34 Monning
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor